NY A09650 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the towns of Fayette and Varick in the county of Seneca to adopt, amend and enforce local laws, rules and regulations not inconsistent with the laws of this state or the United States, with respect to the restriction and regulation of the manner of construction and location of boathouses, moorings and docks in any waters within or bounding the respective municipality to a distance of fifteen hundred feet from the shoreline.
Title
Authorizes the towns of Fayette and Varick in the county of Seneca to adopt, amend and enforce local laws, rules and regulations not inconsistent with the laws of this state or the United States, with respect to the restriction and regulation of the manner of construction and location of boathouses, moorings and docks in any waters within or bounding the respective municipality to a distance of fifteen hundred feet from the shoreline.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.239 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1568 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7135 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1018 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07135 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9650