NY A09667 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides optional disability coverage for county probation officers.
Title
Provides optional disability coverage for county probation officers.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. David DiPietro [R] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-07 | Senate | vetoed memo.288 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1725 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7554 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.959 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07554 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9667