NY A09675 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of Onanda Park from the department of environmental conservation to the town of Canandaigua; requires property to be used for park purposes.
Title
Provides for the transfer of Onanda Park from the department of environmental conservation to the town of Canandaigua; requires property to be used for park purposes.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.209 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.821 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7591 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.131 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.131 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-05-15 | Assembly | reference changed to governmental operations |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07591 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.209