NY A09681 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Detective Brian Mulkeen Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Detective Brian Mulkeen Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | print number 9681a |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06815 (Same As) 2020-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 6815B