NY A09687 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.
Title
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.137 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.406 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7602 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.810 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S07602 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9687