NY A09691 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an occupancy tax in the town of North Castle.
Title
Imposes an occupancy tax in the town of North Castle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | Senate | approval memo.24 |
2016-12-31 | Senate | signed chap.506 |
2016-12-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1993 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7134 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.710 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |