NY A09691 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.210
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.210
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements a residential parking system in the village of Croton-on-Hudson for Young Avenue and Hastings Avenue.
Title
Implements a residential parking system in the village of Croton-on-Hudson for Young Avenue and Hastings Avenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.210 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.826 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7740A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.252 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.252 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 9691a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07740 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.210