NY A09694 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employment of females after child-birth prohibited.
Title
Relates to employment of females after child-birth prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.235 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.191 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a9694 |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.168 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to labor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1843 |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s6391 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.191 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.191 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06391 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.235