NY A09705 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - print number 9705a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Schuyler to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Schuyler to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06Assemblyprint number 9705a
2020-03-06Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2020-02-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01440 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1440B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback