NY A09711 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the sale of municipal notes and bonds of the county of Erie.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the sale of municipal notes and bonds of the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.83 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.569 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7547 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.812 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07547 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9711