NY A09733 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid and the Ironman 70.3.
Title
Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid and the Ironman 70.3.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.164 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.132 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | substituted for a9733b |
2020-06-10 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.743 |
2020-06-07 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8409A |
2020-06-07 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s8409a |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.132 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | print number 9733b |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | print number 9733a |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |