NY A09736 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-21 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the actual innocence justice act of 2010; clarifies that convicted persons who can demonstrate a reasonable probability that they are innocent will have the right to challenge their convictions under the law, notwithstanding any other procedural or technical provisions of law that would have prevented them from doing so.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the actual innocence justice act of 2010; clarifies that convicted persons who can demonstrate a reasonable probability that they are innocent will have the right to challenge their convictions under the law, notwithstanding any other procedural or technical provisions of law that would have prevented them from doing so.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-21 reported referred to rules
2010-06-04 print number 9736b
2010-06-04 amend and recommit to codes
2010-05-19 print number 9736a
2010-05-19 amend and recommit to codes
2010-01-20 referred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S6234-A (Same As) 2010-06-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback