NY A09736 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the powers of the state of NY mortgage agency and extends the provisions of chapter 208 of the laws of 2010 amending the public authorities law relating to the powers of the state of New York mortgage agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the powers of the state of NY mortgage agency and extends the provisions of chapter 208 of the laws of 2010 amending the public authorities law relating to the powers of the state of New York mortgage agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-11Senatesigned chap.280
2014-08-01Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-17SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-17Senate3RD READING CAL.780
2014-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7146
2014-06-12SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2014-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.217
2014-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.217
2014-06-11Assemblyreported
2014-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-05-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-05-20Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S07146 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9736

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback