NY A09761 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that every authorized insurer that issues or issues for delivery in this state a policy of commercial risk insurance insuring against losses or liabilities arising out of the ownership, operation, or use of a motor vehicle, shall establish a group fleet policy insuring against the losses or liabilities arising out of the ownership of motor vehicles engaged in the business of carrying or transporting passengers for-hire, having a seating capacity of not less than eight passengers.
Title
Provides that every authorized insurer that issues or issues for delivery in this state a policy of commercial risk insurance insuring against losses or liabilities arising out of the ownership, operation, or use of a motor vehicle, shall establish a group fleet policy insuring against the losses or liabilities arising out of the ownership of motor vehicles engaged in the business of carrying or transporting passengers for-hire, having a seating capacity of not less than eight passengers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.67 |
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.374 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.469 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a9761a |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1021 |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8437 |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.469 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-28 | Assembly | print number 9761a |
2020-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S08437 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.67