NY A09791 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Herkimer county's mortgage recording tax authorization until 2020.
Title
Extends Herkimer county's mortgage recording tax authorization until 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.141 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1577 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7668 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.765 |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07668 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9791