NY A09802 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts by the Pearl River union free school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the state education department.
Title
Validates certain acts by the Pearl River union free school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the state education department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-27 | Senate | vetoed memo.63 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1022 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8530 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.94 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.94 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | print number 9802a |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08530 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled