NY A09805 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "toll payer protection act" to establish a New York toll payers' bill of rights; provides that any person, firm, corporation, or other entity who is charged with the payment of a cashless toll fee in the state of New York shall have the option to be notified by text message or electronic mail that such fee has been so charged, the entity to which such fee must be paid, and the date by when such fee must be paid; further provides for the establishment of a payment plan for the payment of a toll fee and any related penalties; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "toll payer protection act" to establish a New York toll payers' bill of rights; provides that any person, firm, corporation, or other entity who is charged with the payment of a cashless toll fee in the state of New York shall have the option to be notified by text message or electronic mail that such fee has been so charged, the entity to which such fee must be paid, and the date by when such fee must be paid; further provides for the establishment of a payment plan for the payment of a toll fee and any related penalties; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.341 |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2130 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8946 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1021 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | print number 9805a |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07344 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
S08946 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9805A
S08946 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9805A