NY A09811 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - print number 9811a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending the authorization of the county of Chemung to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes to November 30, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending the authorization of the county of Chemung to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes to November 30, 2023.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06Assemblyprint number 9811a
2020-03-06Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2020-02-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07234 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 7234A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback