NY A09821 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7731a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7731a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of New Castle, in the county of Westchester, to lease space on the sport field fences in 3 of its parks.
Title
Authorizes the town of New Castle, in the county of Westchester, to lease space on the sport field fences in 3 of its parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7731a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.332 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | print number 9821a |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07731 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.343