NY A09823 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including the promotion and expansion of cricket in the state of New York to the jurisdiction of the state athletic commission.
Title
Relates to including the promotion and expansion of cricket in the state of New York to the jurisdiction of the state athletic commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.479 |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | print number 9823a |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S07764 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 7764A