NY A09832 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to declaring the goal of the state of New York to source reduce, reuse, recycle, or compost no less than eighty-five percent of the solid waste generated by the year 2030.
Title
Relates to declaring the goal of the state of New York to source reduce, reuse, recycle, or compost no less than eighty-five percent of the solid waste generated by the year 2030.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.454 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07904 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION