NY A09837 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - amended on third reading 9837a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - amended on third reading 9837a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notice to members of the legislature and certain local officials relating to certain construction and other projects affecting such members' and officials' districts.
Title
Requires notice to members of the legislature and certain local officials relating to certain construction and other projects affecting such members' and officials' districts.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] |
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Michael Reilly [R] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9837a |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.457 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S07823 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - PRINT NUMBER 7823A