NY A09838 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-18 - print number 9838b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-18 - print number 9838b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to port authority organization, appearance and notice; establishes the port authority advisory committee.
Title
Relates to port authority organization, appearance and notice; establishes the port authority advisory committee.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-18 | Assembly | print number 9838b |
2020-07-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | print number 9838a |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |