NY A09864 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Family Service League, Inc. to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption for the 2015 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes Family Service League, Inc. to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption for the 2015 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.143 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1345 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8042 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1022 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08042 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9864