NY A09921 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the department of labor, in consultation with the commissioners of the office of temporary and disability assistance, the department of health, the office of children and family services, and the department of taxation and finance to conduct a study on income eligibility limits for public benefits to assist the poor and the impact that rising wages has or will have on the eligibility of the working poor to receive such benefits.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the department of labor, in consultation with the commissioners of the office of temporary and disability assistance, the department of health, the office of children and family services, and the department of taxation and finance to conduct a study on income eligibility limits for public benefits to assist the poor and the impact that rising wages has or will have on the eligibility of the working poor to receive such benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.257 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.257 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07743 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - REFERRED TO LABOR