NY A09959 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Mount Pleasant to adopt a local law to impose a 3 percent hotel/motel occupancy tax for hotels not located in a village.
Title
Authorizes the town of Mount Pleasant to adopt a local law to impose a 3 percent hotel/motel occupancy tax for hotels not located in a village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.372 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.361 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a9959 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.983 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s7741 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.361 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07741 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.372