NY A09967 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8972b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to real property tax exemptions for certain property owners who are required to participate in the federal flood insurance program because his or her real property is located in a special flood hazard area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to real property tax exemptions for certain property owners who are required to participate in the federal flood insurance program because his or her real property is located in a special flood hazard area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s8972b
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.409
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.409
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-06-15Assemblyprint number 9967b
2018-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2018-06-14Assemblyprint number 9967a
2018-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2018-03-02Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S08972 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.512

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09967&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09967&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09967
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09967&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09967A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09967&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09967B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09967&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09967&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09967&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback