NY A09988 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the pedestrian bridge across the Taconic State Parkway, in the town of Yorktown, county of Westchester as the "Atomic Veterans Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates the pedestrian bridge across the Taconic State Parkway, in the town of Yorktown, county of Westchester as the "Atomic Veterans Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] | Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | print number 9988b |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | print number 9988a |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |