NY A09993 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7912a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7912a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.
Title
Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s7912a |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.56 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.56 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-20 | Assembly | print number 9993a |
2018-04-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07912 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.321