NY A09996 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s7821a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s7821a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to electronic payment of fees of brand label registration and to changing the time required for an application to be deemed approved.
Title
Relates to electronic payment of fees of brand label registration and to changing the time required for an application to be deemed approved.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s7821a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9996b |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.731 |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | print number 9996a |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07821 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.440