NY A10001 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of mining and the reclamation of mines within counties with a population of one million or more which draw their primary source of drinking water for a majority of county residents from a designated sole source aquifer.
Title
Provides for the regulation of mining and the reclamation of mines within counties with a population of one million or more which draw their primary source of drinking water for a majority of county residents from a designated sole source aquifer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | tabled |
2020-12-15 | Senate | vetoed memo.73 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.841 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8026 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.291 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.291 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08026 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - tabled