NY A10006 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to critical energy infrastructure security and responsibility; relates to the protection of critical infrastructure in the state.
Title
Relates to critical energy infrastructure security and responsibility; relates to the protection of critical infrastructure in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S08794 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - REFERRED TO RULES