NY A10015 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to death benefits for certain members under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections and community supervision.
Title
Relates to death benefits for certain members under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections and community supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7525 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.410 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.410 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07525 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.320