NY A10030 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7166c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7166c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Phoenix to alienate and sell parklands at fair market value to the Phoenix Central School District with the understanding that such village shall dedicate an amount equal to or greater than the fair market value of such parklands being alienated to the acquisition of new parklands and/or improvements to existing parklands.
Title
Authorizes the village of Phoenix to alienate and sell parklands at fair market value to the Phoenix Central School District with the understanding that such village shall dedicate an amount equal to or greater than the fair market value of such parklands being alienated to the acquisition of new parklands and/or improvements to existing parklands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7166c |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.411 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.411 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | print number 10030b |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | print number 10030a |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07166 (Same As) 2018-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.198