NY A10041 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the revenue threshold for annual audit of fire districts from three hundred thousand dollars to four hundred thousand dollars.
Title
Increases the revenue threshold for annual audit of fire districts from three hundred thousand dollars to four hundred thousand dollars.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Melissa Miller [R] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.262 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.850 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8220 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.260 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.260 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08220 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.262