NY A10044 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.149
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.149
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the residency requirement for the court clerk for the town of Sodus in the county of Wayne; permits such court clerk to not be an elector of such town.
Title
Relates to the residency requirement for the court clerk for the town of Sodus in the county of Wayne; permits such court clerk to not be an elector of such town.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Oaks [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.149 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.948 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7980A |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.928 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | print number 10044a |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07980 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10044A