NY A10060 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.262
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.262
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the Newkirk Avenue subway station on the IRT Nostrand Avenue line the "Newkirk Avenue -- Little Haiti station".
Title
Renames the Newkirk Avenue subway station on the IRT Nostrand Avenue line the "Newkirk Avenue -- Little Haiti station".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.262 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.262 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | print number 10060b |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | print number 10060a |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08341 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE