NY A10063 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8000b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8000b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on the effects of trauma on child development and learning and report the findings of such study and any recommendations to the governor and legislature.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on the effects of trauma on child development and learning and report the findings of such study and any recommendations to the governor and legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8000b |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.471 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | print number 10063b |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | print number 10063a |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08000 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.18