NY A10068 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the social services district to take no action to establish paternity or a child support order when the applicant or recipient for aid to dependent children has established good cause to refuse to cooperate.
Title
Directs the social services district to take no action to establish paternity or a child support order when the applicant or recipient for aid to dependent children has established good cause to refuse to cooperate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10068a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2020-07-06 | Assembly | reference changed to social services |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07547 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES