NY A10090 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - approval memo.22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - approval memo.22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to uninsured and underinsured motorist coverage for corporate and business entities, volunteer fire departments and volunteer ambulance services.
Title
Relates to uninsured and underinsured motorist coverage for corporate and business entities, volunteer fire departments and volunteer ambulance services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Senate | approval memo.22 |
2012-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.496 |
2012-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1439 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7312B |
2012-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 10090b |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.237 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.237 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | print number 10090a |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07312 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10090B