NY A10093 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.545
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.545
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Northern New York power proceeds allocation act"; establishes the five member northern New York power proceeds allocation board to review and recommend applications for fund benefits pursuant to certain criteria set forth; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "Northern New York power proceeds allocation act"; establishes the five member northern New York power proceeds allocation board to review and recommend applications for fund benefits pursuant to certain criteria set forth; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | signed chap.545 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1582 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7870 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.514 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.514 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 10093a |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2014-06-13 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S07870 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10093A