NY A10095 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7935a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7935a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town justice court of the town of Canandaigua to hold justice court in the city of Canandaigua.
Title
Authorizes the town justice court of the town of Canandaigua to hold justice court in the city of Canandaigua.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s7935a |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1033 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | print number 10095a |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07935 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.441