NY A10097 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - signed chap.192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes certain lands used in the single operation for the production of hopyards in the definition of agricultural land and provides a real property tax abatement for the owners of certain hopyards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes certain lands used in the single operation for the production of hopyards in the definition of agricultural land and provides a real property tax abatement for the owners of certain hopyards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16Senatesigned chap.192
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1778
2018-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8841
2018-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1034
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-04-24Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-03-14Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S08841 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10097

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10097&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10097&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10097
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10097&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10097&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10097&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10097#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback