NY A10128 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - signed chap.193
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing custom liquor production for a non-licensed individual by farm distilleries; establishes conditions for such production including that such custom liquor shall not be offered for sale.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing custom liquor production for a non-licensed individual by farm distilleries; establishes conditions for such production including that such custom liquor shall not be offered for sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16Senatesigned chap.193
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1951
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7793A
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.247
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.247
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-06-01Assemblyprint number 10128a
2018-06-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to economic development
2018-03-16Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S07793 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10128A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10128&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10128&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10128
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10128&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10128A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10128&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10128&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10128&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10128#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10128&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback