NY A10143 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8021a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8021a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Family Service League to file an application for retroactive real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes the Family Service League to file an application for retroactive real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8021a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 10143a |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1038 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08021 (Same As) 2018-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.199