NY A10147 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Minerva Lake as an inland waterway for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Minerva Lake as an inland waterway for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.153 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1374 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7989B |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1039 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | print number 10147b |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | print number 10147a |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07989 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10147B