NY A10159 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to remedying the inconsistent definitions for local correctional facility and municipal official and fixes other technical errors.
Title
Relates to remedying the inconsistent definitions for local correctional facility and municipal official and fixes other technical errors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.247 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-05-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.856 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8048 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.732 |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08048 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10159