NY A10174 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the education law relating to the licensure of pathologists' assistants, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Amends the education law relating to the licensure of pathologists' assistants, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.85 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.807 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8088 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.772 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08088 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10174