NY A10176 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the MTA to study and report on the feasibility of rehabilitating the Lefferts Boulevard Bridge and requires the chairman of the MTA to submit a written report with the findings and recommendations of the study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the MTA to study and report on the feasibility of rehabilitating the Lefferts Boulevard Bridge and requires the chairman of the MTA to submit a written report with the findings and recommendations of the study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.342
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1594
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8029A
2018-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1040
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-09Assemblyprint number 10176a
2018-04-09Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2018-03-22Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S08029 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10176A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10176&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10176&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10176
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10176&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10176A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10176&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10176&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10176&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10176#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback