NY A10179 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8141a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the MTA to hold public hearings prior to certain transportation facility closures; provides that the MTA hold a public hearing on any proposed closings due to construction, improvement, reconstruction or rehabilitation where such facility will be out-of-service for ninety days or longer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the MTA to hold public hearings prior to certain transportation facility closures; provides that the MTA hold a public hearing on any proposed closings due to construction, improvement, reconstruction or rehabilitation where such facility will be out-of-service for ninety days or longer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s8141a
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.249
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.249
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-03-22Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S08141 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.23

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback